CA AB1383 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 29, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 87623 of the Education Code, relating to community colleges.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Community colleges: academic employees: involuntary administrative leave.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-17 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB1383 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Assembly - AB 1383 Carrillo Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-28 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 29, Statutes of 2021.
2021-06-28 Approved by the Governor.
2021-06-22 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:15 p.m.
2021-06-17AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2021-06-17SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0.).
2021-06-10SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2021-06-09SenateFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 9).
2021-05-19SenateReferred to Com. on ED.
2021-05-06SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2021-05-06AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1334.)
2021-04-13AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-04-12AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 8).
2021-03-26AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2021-03-25AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
2021-03-11AssemblyReferred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2021-02-22AssemblyRead first time.
2021-02-20AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
2021-02-19AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code87623Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback