CA AB1381 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Environmental Safety and Toxic Materials Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 116355 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to drinking water.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Safe Drinking Water Plan.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-09AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2019-03-19AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
2019-03-18AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-18AssemblyReferred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
2019-02-25AssemblyRead first time.
2019-02-23AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
2019-02-22AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code116355Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback