CA AB1373 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-01 - Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-01 - Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 1.5 (commencing with Section 32205) to Chapter 2 of Part 19 of Division 1 of Title 1 of the Education Code, relating to pupils.
Title
Pupils: healthy relationships promotion and teen dating
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-01 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |
2011-05-27 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | |
2011-05-04 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2011-04-27 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-04-26 | Read second time and amended. | |
2011-04-25 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (April 13). | |
2011-03-31 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |
2011-03-30 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-03-21 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |
2011-02-20 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | |
2011-02-18 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 32205 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 32230 | New Code | See Bill Text |