CA AB1373 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 533, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 533, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 17537.10 to the Business and Professions Code, relating to advertising.
Title
Advertising: grant deed copy services.
Sponsors
Sen. Ted Lieu [D] | Sen. Nancy Skinner [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-08-25 - Assembly - AB 1373 LIEU Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 62 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-24 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1373 Lieu By Lowenthal (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-03 - Assembly - AB 1373 SKINNER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 30 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass. (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-24 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1373 Lieu By Lowenthal (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-03 - Assembly - AB 1373 SKINNER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 30 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass. (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 533, Statutes of 2010. | |
2010-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2010-09-03 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2010-08-25 | Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 62. Noes 16. Page 6639.) | |
2010-08-24 | From committee: With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 24). | |
2010-08-17 | Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. | |
2010-08-12 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 17 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2010-08-12 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 9. Page 4495.) | |
2010-08-03 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-08-02 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2010-06-29 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-06-28 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 22). | |
2010-06-10 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2010-06-02 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2009-06-18 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2009-06-04 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2009-06-03 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 30. Page 2056.) | |
2009-06-02 | Read third time, amended, and returned to third reading. (Page 1936.). | |
2009-05-29 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28). Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-04-29 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2009-04-21 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (April 20). | |
2009-04-16 | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | |
2009-04-14 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. | |
2009-03-31 | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | |
2009-03-02 | Read first time. | |
2009-03-01 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 30. | |
2009-02-27 | Introduced. To print. |