CA AB137 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act relating to the Budget Act of 2015.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Budget Act of 2015.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-23 - Assembly - AB 137 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By WEBER (Y: 51 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-11-30SenateFrom Senate committee without further action.
2015-03-23SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. Referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2015-03-23AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 27. Page 652.)
2015-03-19AssemblyAssembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 25. Page 611.) Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 25. Page 611.) Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
2015-01-16AssemblyReferred to Com. on BUDGET.
2015-01-12AssemblyRead first time. From printer. May be heard in committee February 11.
2015-01-09AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback