CA AB1366 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-30 - Died on Senate inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-30 - Died on Senate inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 68130.6 to, and to add Chapter 3.67 (commencing with Section 44778) to Part 25 of Division 3 of Title 2 of, the Education Code, relating to public postsecondary education.
Title
Public postsecondary education: Dream Resource Liaisons.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-08-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-24 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - Assembly - AB 1366 LOPEZ Assembly Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-08-24 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - Assembly - AB 1366 LOPEZ Assembly Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | Died on Senate inactive file. |
2015-09-09 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Jackson. |
2015-09-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-31 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 27). |
2015-08-24 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2015-08-18 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-08-17 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (July 15). |
2015-07-08 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2015-06-03 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-06-03 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 23. Page 1882.) |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28). |
2015-05-13 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2015-05-11 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-05-07 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 2.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-03-23 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2015-03-02 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2015-03-01 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 31. |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 68130.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |