CA AB1364 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-20 - Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Ayes 20. Noes 12. Page 1474.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-20 - Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Ayes 20. Noes 12. Page 1474.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1700.47 of the Labor Code, relating to employment.
Title
Employment: licensed talent agencies: representation.
Sponsors
Asm. Nora Campos [D] | Asm. Mike Gatto [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-26 - Assembly - AB 1364 CAMPOS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Arts, Entertain, Sports, Tourism, & Internet Media (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Arts, Entertain, Sports, Tourism, & Internet Media (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-20 | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Ayes 20. Noes 12. Page 1474.) | |
2011-06-03 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-06-02 | Referred to Coms. on L. & I.R. and JUD. | |
2011-05-26 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-05-26 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 64. Noes 6. Page 1559.) | |
2011-05-19 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-18 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 18). | |
2011-05-09 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (received May 6 pursuant to Joint Rule 61(a)(2)) | |
2011-04-14 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. | |
2011-04-05 | Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. | |
2011-04-04 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-03-21 | Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. | |
2011-02-20 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | |
2011-02-18 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 1700.47 | Amended Code | Citation Text |