CA AB136 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 511, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 511, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 17275.4 to the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Personal Income Tax Law: deductions: charitable contributions: business expenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-05 - Assembly - AB 136 Quirk-Silva Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-03 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB136 Quirk-Silva By McGuire (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Assembly - AB 136 Quirk-Silva Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - AB 136 Quirk-Silva Assembly Third Reading Amend By QUIRK-SILVA Set #1 (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-03 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB136 Quirk-Silva By McGuire (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Assembly - AB 136 Quirk-Silva Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - AB 136 Quirk-Silva Assembly Third Reading Amend By QUIRK-SILVA Set #1 (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-04 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 511, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-04 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-11 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-05 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3013.). |
2019-09-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 5 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-09-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2439.). |
2019-07-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-07-08 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 26). |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2118.) |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 1857.) |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 16). |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1760.) |
2019-05-15 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1609.) |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96(a). |
2019-04-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-04-01 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-19 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-01-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-01-07 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2018-12-06 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 5. |
2018-12-05 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17275.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |