CA AB1353 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 173, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 173, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 220.5 of the Streets and Highways Code, relating to highway rest areas.
Title
Highway rest areas: vending machines: utility costs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-07-16 - Senate - Special Consent #5 AB1353 Patterson (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-06 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1353 PATTERSON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-07-06 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1353 PATTERSON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 173, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-08-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-08-03 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2015-07-16 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2015-07-16 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1987.). |
2015-07-13 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2015-07-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-07-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 6). |
2015-06-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1729.) |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-04-22 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2015-04-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-03-23 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2015-03-02 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2015-03-01 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 31. |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Streets and Highways Code | 220.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |