CA AB135 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-09-04 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-09-04 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 5080.42 to the Public Resources Code, relating to state parks, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
State parks: California Citrus State Historic Park:
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-07-06 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-03 - Assembly - AB 135 JEFFRIES Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-03 - Assembly - AB 135 JEFFRIES Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-09-04 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2009-09-02 | Joint Rules 61(a)(12) and 62(a) suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 2115.) | |
2009-08-25 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. | |
2009-08-24 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-08-17 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2009-07-13 | Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-07-09 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 6). | |
2009-06-18 | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. | |
2009-06-04 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2009-06-03 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2071.) | |
2009-06-01 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |
2009-05-29 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (May 28). Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | |
2009-05-20 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2009-05-05 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-05-04 | Read second time and amended. | |
2009-04-30 | Action rescinded whereby the bill was reported from committee with author's amendments and whereby the bill was read second time and amended on April 20 | |
2009-04-21 | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | |
2009-04-20 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. | |
2009-04-02 | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | |
2009-04-01 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. | |
2009-02-26 | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | |
2009-01-21 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 20. | |
2009-01-20 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 5080.42 | New Code | See Bill Text |