CA AB1349 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-07-11 - In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 9 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 2030.210 and 2033.210, of the Code of Civil Procedure, relating to civil actions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Civil actions: discovery.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-25 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Assembly - AB 1349 Obernolte Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-11AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 9 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2019-07-11SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.).
2019-06-27SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2019-06-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 25).
2019-06-14SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2019-06-10SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-05-01SenateReferred to Com. on JUD.
2019-04-23SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-04-22AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1260.)
2019-04-09AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2019-04-08AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2019-04-04AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 2).
2019-03-21AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2019-03-11AssemblyReferred to Com. on JUD.
2019-02-25AssemblyRead first time.
2019-02-23AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
2019-02-22AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback