CA AB1349 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Division 30 (commencing with Section 81000) to the Water Code, relating to water, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
CalConserve Water Use Efficiency Revolving Fund.
Sponsors
Asm. Mike Gatto [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-03 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2014-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2013-05-24 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. |
2013-05-08 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2013-04-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-03-14 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on W.,P. & W. |
2013-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2013-02-24 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 26. |
2013-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Water Code | 81000 | New Code | See Bill Text |