CA AB1346 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 693, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 693, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 3099 and 3099.2 of the Labor Code, relating to employment.
Title
Division of Apprenticeship Standards: certification of
Sponsors
Sen. Toni Atkins [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-08-25 - Assembly - AB 1346 ATKINS Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 51 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-08-22 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1346 Atkins By DeSaulnier (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-29 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-23 - Assembly - AB 1346 ATKINS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-08-22 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1346 Atkins By DeSaulnier (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-29 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-23 - Assembly - AB 1346 ATKINS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 693, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-10-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2011-08-31 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m. | |
2011-08-25 | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 51. Noes 25. Page 2567.). | |
2011-08-22 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2011-08-22 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 12. Page 2014.). | |
2011-08-17 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-08-16 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2011-08-15 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2011-06-29 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-06-20 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-06-02 | Referred to Com. on L. & I.R. | |
2011-05-23 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-05-23 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 24. Page 1512.) | |
2011-05-19 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-18 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 18). | |
2011-05-05 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (May 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-04-04 | Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. | |
2011-03-31 | Referred to Com. on L. & E. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-02-20 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | |
2011-02-18 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 3099 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 3099.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |