CA AB1344 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on October 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 796, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on October 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 796, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 2105.5 of, and to add Section 2105.6 to, the Elections Code, relating to elections.
Title
Voting rights: inmates and persons formerly incarcerated.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-11 - Assembly - AB 1344 WEBER Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 48 N: 28 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1344 colspan="2"> ? (Y: 5 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1344 Weber et al. By Hertzberg (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Assembly - AB 1344 WEBER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 27 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1344 colspan="2"> ? (Y: 5 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1344 Weber et al. By Hertzberg (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Assembly - AB 1344 WEBER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 27 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-14 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 796, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-14 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-19 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2017-09-11 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 48. Noes 28. Page 3116.). |
2017-09-05 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 7 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2017-09-05 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 11. Page 2459.). |
2017-08-29 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-08-28 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2017-07-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-07-10 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2017-06-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 46. Noes 27. Page 1779.) |
2017-05-22 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1659.) |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-17 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 17). |
2017-05-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-05-03 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2017-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-03-28 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-03-13 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Elections Code | 2105.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 2105.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |