CA AB1340 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-08-27 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 3102, 3103, and 3103.5 of, and to add Sections 3103.6 and 3103.7 to, the Elections Code, relating to elections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Special absentee voters.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2009-08-24 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-07 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-28 - Assembly - AB 1340 LOWENTHAL Assembly Third Reading (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2009-08-27 In committee: Held under submission.
2009-08-24 In committee: Placed on Appropriations suspense file.
2009-08-17 In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2009-08-17 From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2009-07-14 Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2009-07-13 From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 7).
2009-07-02 From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., R., & C.A.
2009-06-11 Referred to Com. on E., R., & C.A.
2009-05-28 In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2009-05-28 Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1752.)
2009-05-26 Read second time. To third reading.
2009-05-21 From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 20).
2009-04-22 From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 21).
2009-03-31 Referred to Com. on E. & R.
2009-03-02 Read first time.
2009-03-01 From printer. May be heard in committee March 30.
2009-02-27 Introduced. To print.

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_1340&sess=0910&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_1301-1350/ab_1340_bill_20090227_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_1301-1350/ab_1340_bill_20090702_amended_sen_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_1301-1350/ab_1340_bill_20090714_amended_sen_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_1301-1350/ab_1340_bill_20090817_amended_sen_v96.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_1301-1350/ab_1340_vote_20090421_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_1301-1350/ab_1340_vote_20090520_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_1301-1350/ab_1340_vote_20090528_1252PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_1301-1350/ab_1340_vote_20090707_000002_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_1301-1350/ab_1340_vote_20090824_000003_sen_comm.html

Bill Comments 750

feedback