CA AB134 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 254, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend the Budget Act of 2017 (Chapter 14 of the Statutes of 2017) by amending Items 6440-001-0001, 6610-001-0001, and 6870-101-0001 of, and adding Item 3900-101-3228 to, Section 2.00 of that act, relating to the state budget, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, budget bill.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Budget Act of 2017.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-15 - Assembly - AB 134 BUDGET Concurrence in Senate Amendments By TING (Y: 58 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-15 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB134 BUDGET (Ting) By Mitchell (Y: 28 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-13 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Assembly - AB 134 TING Assembly Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 25 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-16 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 254, Statutes of 2017.
2017-09-16 Approved by the Governor.
2017-09-15AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
2017-09-15AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 58. Noes 19. Page 3464.).
2017-09-15AssemblyAssembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 54. Noes 25. Page 3462.)
2017-09-15AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2017-09-15SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 9. Page 2945.).
2017-09-14SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-09-13SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (September 13).
2017-09-12SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2017-09-11SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2017-09-11SenateSenate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Ayes 27. Noes 12. Page 2664.)
2017-09-11SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2017-09-05SenateJoint Rules 61 and 62 suspended. (Ayes 27. Noes 13. Page 2424.)
2017-05-18SenateReferred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2017-05-18SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-05-18AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 45. Noes 25. Page 1610.)
2017-05-15AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-15AssemblyOrdered to second reading.
2017-05-15AssemblyWithdrawn from committee.
2017-05-15AssemblyAssembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 52. Noes 25. Page 1511.)
2017-01-19AssemblyReferred to Com. on BUDGET.
2017-01-11AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 10.
2017-01-10AssemblyRead first time. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback