CA AB133 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 794, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 794, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 16183 of the Government Code, and to amend Section 20585 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Property tax postponement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-10 - Assembly - AB 133 Quirk-Silva Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-09 - Senate - Special Consent AB133 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - AB 133 Quirk-Silva Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-09 - Senate - Special Consent AB133 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - AB 133 Quirk-Silva Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-12 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 794, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-12 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-18 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3292.). |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3252.) |
2019-09-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-09-09 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2710.). |
2019-09-04 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30). |
2019-07-08 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-20 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 19). |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2019-05-24 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1917.) |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-17 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (May 16). |
2019-04-03 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-03-11 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-06 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 4). |
2019-02-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2019-02-19 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. |
2019-02-15 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2019-01-07 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2018-12-06 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 5. |
2018-12-05 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 16183 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 20585 | Amended Code | Citation Text |