CA AB133 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 253, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 253, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 26001, 26040, 26053, 26055, 26060.1, 26069, 26070, 26090, 26104, 26130, 26140, and 26227.9 of the Business and Professions Code, to amend Sections 11553 and 11553.5 of the Government Code, to amend Section 11357 of the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Sections 34010, 34011, 34012, 34012.5, and 55044 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to cannabis, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Cannabis Regulation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-15 - Assembly - AB 133 BUDGET Concurrence in Senate Amendments By TING (Y: 62 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-15 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB133 BUDGET (Ting) By Mitchell (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-13 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Assembly - AB 133 TING Assembly Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 25 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-15 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB133 BUDGET (Ting) By Mitchell (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-13 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Assembly - AB 133 TING Assembly Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 25 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-16 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 253, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-09-16 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-15 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2017-09-15 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 62. Noes 17. Page 3468.). |
2017-09-15 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 54. Noes 25. Page 3462.) |
2017-09-15 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2017-09-15 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 9. Page 2948.). |
2017-09-14 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 2.) (September 13). |
2017-09-12 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-09-11 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2017-09-11 | Senate | Senate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Ayes 27. Noes 12. Page 2664.) |
2017-09-11 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-09-06 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2017-09-05 | Senate | Joint Rules 61 and 62 suspended. (Ayes 27. Noes 13. Page 2424.) |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2017-05-18 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 45. Noes 25. Page 1609.) |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 52. Noes 25. Page 1511.) |
2017-01-19 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2017-01-11 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 10. |
2017-01-10 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |