CA AB133 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 2, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 2, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend the Budget Act of 2015 (Chapters 10 and 11 of the Statutes of 2015), by amending Item 6440-001-0001 of, and adding Items 2660-013-0001, 3970-001-0001, and 9651-001-0001 to, Section 2.00 of, and amending Section 39.00 of, that act, relating to the state budget, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, budget bill.
Title
Budget Act of 2015.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-29 - Assembly - AB 133 BUDGET Concurrence in Senate Amendments By WEBER (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB133 Committee On BUDGET (Weber) By Leno (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - Assembly - AB 133 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By WEBER (Y: 51 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB133 Committee On BUDGET (Weber) By Leno (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - Assembly - AB 133 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By WEBER (Y: 51 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-01 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 2, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-03-01 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-02-29 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5:30 p.m. |
2016-02-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after March 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3767.) Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 3767.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3767.). |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 3145.). |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-02-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (February 23). |
2016-02-22 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Ayes 24. Noes 6. Page 3053.) |
2015-03-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2015-03-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 27. Page 650.) |
2015-03-19 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 25. Page 611.) Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 25. Page 611.) Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-01-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2015-01-12 | Assembly | Read first time. From printer. May be heard in committee February 11. |
2015-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |