CA AB133 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-01 - Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-01 - Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 20.1 (commencing with Section 2704.25) to Division 3 of the Streets and Highways Code, relating to high-speed rail.
Title
High-speed rail.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-01 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |
2011-05-02 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-04-25 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-02-03 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | |
2011-01-13 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 12. | |
2011-01-12 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Streets and Highways Code | 2704.25 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_133&sess=1112&house=A |
Text | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0101-0150/ab_133_bill_20110112_introduced.html |