CA AB1327 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-29 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 14105.22 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to Medi-Cal.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medi-Cal: reimbursement rates.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-08-31 - Assembly - AB 1327 Petrie-Norris Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-31 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-31 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in, but first be re-referred to Com. on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-28 - Senate - Special Consent AB1327 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-01 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Assembly - AB 1327 Petrie-Norris Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-29 Vetoed by Governor.
2020-09-14AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2020-08-31AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0.).
2020-08-31AssemblyFrom committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 31).
2020-08-31AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended.
2020-08-31AssemblyFrom committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 31). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-08-30AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended.
2020-08-30AssemblyRe-referred to Coms. on HEALTH and APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
2020-08-28AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2020-08-28SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.).
2020-08-25SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2020-08-20SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-08-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 20).
2020-08-13SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2020-08-01SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-08-22SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2019-05-16SenateReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2019-05-02SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-02AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1478.)
2019-04-25AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2019-04-24AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 24).
2019-04-08AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-04AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2019-04-03AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 2).
2019-03-28AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2019-03-27AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-11AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2019-02-25AssemblyRead first time.
2019-02-23AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
2019-02-22AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Welfare and Institutions Code14105.22Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback