CA AB1321 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 19841, 19862, and 19961 of, to repeal Section 19961.06 of, and to repeal and add Section 19965 of, the Business and Professions Code, relating to gambling.
Title
Gambling establishments.
Sponsors
Asm. Tom Lackey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2022-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2021-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2021-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 19841 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 19862 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 19961 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 19961.06 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 19965 | New Code | See Bill Text |