CA AB1320 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 467, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 467, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 23826.11 to the Business and Professions Code, relating to alcoholic beverages.
Title
Alcoholic beverages: licenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-08-30 - Assembly - AB 1320 ALLEN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-08-29 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1320 Allen By Leno (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-07 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1320 Allen By Negrete McLeod (Y: 22 N: 14 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-15 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - Assembly - AB 1320 ALLEN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-29 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1320 Allen By Leno (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-07 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1320 Allen By Negrete McLeod (Y: 22 N: 14 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-15 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - Assembly - AB 1320 ALLEN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-23 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 467, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-09-23 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2012-09-13 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:15 p.m. | |
2012-08-30 | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 1. Page 6616.). | |
2012-08-29 | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (August 29). | |
2012-08-28 | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 6404.) | |
2012-08-24 | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. | |
2012-08-22 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2012-08-21 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4642.). | |
2012-08-07 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-06 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2012-06-26 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-06-14 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c). Re-referred to Com. on G.O. | |
2012-06-12 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-06-11 | Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and to Assembly. Ordered to third reading. Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2012-06-04 | In Senate. Held at Desk. | |
2012-05-31 | Ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-05-30 | From inactive file. Ordered to the unfinished business file. | |
2012-05-29 | Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Allen. | |
2011-09-09 | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Allen. | |
2011-09-07 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. | |
2011-09-07 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 14. Page 2359.). | |
2011-09-06 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-09-02 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2011-08-30 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-08-29 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (August 25). | |
2011-08-15 | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2011-06-28 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-06-23 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. | |
2011-06-16 | Referred to Com. on P.E. & R. | |
2011-06-02 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-06-02 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 26. Page 1814.) | |
2011-05-31 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-27 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 27). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2011-05-18 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2011-05-04 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (May 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-03-21 | Referred to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S. | |
2011-02-20 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | |
2011-02-18 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 23826.11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 20814 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 20814.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 20816 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 31453.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |