CA AB132 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 144, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 1798.24 of the Civil Code, to amend Sections 10851, 10852, 10855, 10858, 10859, 44230, 60900, 66021.2, 66021.9, 66744, 69432, 69432.9, 69434, 69434.5, 69435, 69437, 69437.6, 69465, 69617, 69951, 69952, 69954, 69956, 69958, 69959, 69960, 69962, 69963, 69964, 69967, 69996.2, 69996.3, 69996.6, 70022, 70023, 76300, 78052, 84321.62, 84750.4, and 94892.6 of, to amend the heading of Article 18 (commencing with Section 69950) of Chapter 2 of Part 42 of Division 5 of Title 3 of, to add Sections 51225.7, 60900.5, 66023.5, 69996.7, 69996.8, and 69996.9 to, to add the heading of Article 1 (commencing with Section 10850) to, to add Article 2 (commencing with Section 10860) to, Chapter 8.5 of Part 7 of Division 1 of Title 1 of, to add Article 3.5 (commencing with Section 69435.5) to, to add Article 10 (commencing with Section 69470) to, Chapter 1.7 of, to add Article 9 (commencing with Section 69670) to Chapter 2 of, Part 42 of Division 5 of, to add Article 6.4 (commencing with Section 92657) to Chapter 6 of, to add Chapter 16 (commencing with Section 93000) to Part 57 of Division 9 of, to add Chapter 5.7 (commencing with Section 99275) to Part 65 of Division 14 of, and to add Part 53.5 (commencing with Section 88750) to Division 7 of, Title 3 of, to add and repeal Sections 66744.1 and 66744.2 of, to repeal Sections 69965, 69966, 69968, 69969.5, 89007.7, 89780, and 92060 of, and to repeal and add Sections 69950 and 69969 of, the Education Code, to add the heading of Part 1 (commencing with Section 32000) to, and to add Part 2 (commencing with Section 32100) to, Division 14.8 of the Food and Agricultural Code, to add Section 8334.1 to the Government Code, to amend Section 20662 of the Public Contract Code, to amend Section 1095 of the Unemployment Insurance Code, and to amend Items 6870-101-0001, 6870-121-0001, 6980-101-0001, and 6980-101-3263 of Section 2.00 of the Budget Act of 2020 (Chapters 6 and 7 of the Statutes of 2020 and Chapter 4 of the Statutes of 2021), relating to postsecondary education, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Postsecondary education trailer bill.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-07-15 - Assembly - AB 132 BUDGET Concurrence in Senate Amendments By TING (Y: 63 N: 9 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-15 - Senate - Assembly 2nd Reading AB132 BUDGET (Ting) By Skinner (Y: 32 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-14 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Assembly - AB 132 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 56 N: 18 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-27 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 144, Statutes of 2021.
2021-07-27 Approved by the Governor.
2021-07-15 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2021-07-15AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling.
2021-07-15AssemblyAssembly Rule 63 suspended.
2021-07-15AssemblyAssembly Rule 77 suspended.
2021-07-15AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 17 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2021-07-15SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 4.).
2021-07-15SenateSenate Rule 29 suspended. (Ayes 28. Noes 7.)
2021-07-15SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-07-14SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 2.) (July 14).
2021-07-09SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2021-07-07SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2021-06-28SenateJoint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Ayes 31. Noes 9.)
2021-06-24SenateJoint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Ayes 29. Noes 9.)
2021-03-11SenateReferred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2021-02-25SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2021-02-25AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 18. Page 477.)
2021-02-23AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-02-22AssemblyOrdered to second reading.
2021-02-22AssemblyWithdrawn from committee.
2021-02-22AssemblyAssembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 17. Page 432.)
2021-02-22AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
2021-02-18AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on BUDGET. Read second time and amended.
2021-01-28AssemblyReferred to Com. on BUDGET.
2021-01-11AssemblyRead first time.
2021-01-09AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 9.
2021-01-08AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Civil Code1798.24Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code10851Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code10852Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code10855Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code10858Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code10859Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code44230Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code51225.7New CodeSee Bill Text
Education Code60900Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code60900.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Education Code66021.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code66021.9Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code66023.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Education Code66744Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code66744.1Repealed CodeCitation Text
Education Code66744.2Repealed CodeCitation Text
Education Code69432Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code69432.9Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code69434Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code69434.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code69435Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code69437Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code69437.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code69465Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code69617Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code69951Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code69952Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code69954Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code69956Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code69958Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code69959Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code69960Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code69962Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code69963Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code69964Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code69967Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code69996.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code69996.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code69996.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code69996.7New CodeSee Bill Text
Education Code69996.8New CodeSee Bill Text
Education Code69996.9New CodeSee Bill Text
Education Code70022Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code70023Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code76300Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code78052Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code84321.62Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code84750.4Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code94892.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Food and Agricultural Code32000New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code8334.1New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Contract Code1095Amended CodeCitation Text
Unemployment Insurance Code20662Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback