CA AB1317 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 634, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 44275 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to vehicular air pollution.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Carl Moyer Memorial Air Quality Standards Attainment Program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-06 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1317 Gray By Cannella (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Assembly - AB 1317 GRAY Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-10 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 634, Statutes of 2017.
2017-10-10 Approved by the Governor.
2017-09-13AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2017-09-06AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2017-09-06SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2528.).
2017-09-05SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-09-01SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 1).
2017-08-21SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2017-07-13SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2017-07-06SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-06-28SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on EQ. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
2017-05-24SenateReferred to Coms. on T. & H. and EQ.
2017-05-11SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-05-11AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1484.)
2017-05-04AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2017-05-03AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 3).
2017-04-18AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-04-18AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2017-04-17AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
2017-03-16AssemblyReferred to Com. on TRANS.
2017-02-19AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
2017-02-17AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code44275Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code44281Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback