CA AB1317 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-01 - Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-01 - Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 33331 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to redevelopment.
Title
Community development: plan consistency.
Sponsors
Asm. Chris Norby [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-01 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |
2011-04-05 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-03-21 | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV. | |
2011-02-20 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | |
2011-02-18 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 33331 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_1317&sess=1112&house=A |
Text | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_1301-1350/ab_1317_bill_20110218_introduced.html |