CA AB1314 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-02 - Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-02 - Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 12525.3 to the Government Code, relating to law enforcement.
Title
Law enforcement use of force settlements and judgements: reporting.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-24 - Assembly - AB 1314 Medina Assembly Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-02 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2020-06-26 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2019-05-24 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 63. Noes 0. Page 1974.) |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-17 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2019-05-17 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (May 16). |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2019-03-14 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-14 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2019-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 12525.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |