CA AB1313 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 518, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Title 1.6C.7 (commencing with Section 1788.90) to Part 4 of Division 3 of the Civil Code, and to amend Sections 66022 and 76225 of the Education Code, relating to student debts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Higher education: prohibited debt collection practices.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-09 - Assembly - AB 1313 Luz Rivas Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1313 Luz Rivas By Roth (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - AB 1313 Luz Rivas Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-04 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 518, Statutes of 2019.
2019-10-04 Approved by the Governor.
2019-09-17AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2019-09-09AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3146.).
2019-09-06AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2019-09-05SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2587.).
2019-08-30SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-08-30SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30).
2019-08-12SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-07-03SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-06-19SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2019-06-06SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
2019-06-06SenateReferred to Coms. on ED. and JUD.
2019-05-24SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-23AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1885.)
2019-05-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 16).
2019-05-01AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-04-22AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-11AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
2019-04-10AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-03-11AssemblyReferred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2019-02-25AssemblyRead first time.
2019-02-23AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
2019-02-22AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Civil Code1788.90New CodeSee Bill Text
Education Code66022Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code76225Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback