CA AB1313 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-08-31 - Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 48. Noes 27. Page 6804.) Assembly refused to concur in Senate amendments. (Ayes 35. Noes 33. Page 6808.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-08-31 - Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 48. Noes 27. Page 6804.) Assembly refused to concur in Senate amendments. (Ayes 35. Noes 33. Page 6808.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 554 of the Labor Code, relating to employment.
Title
Overtime wages: agricultural workers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-08-31 - Assembly - AB 1313 ALLEN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 35 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2012-08-31 - Assembly - AB 1313 ALLEN Concurrence in Senate Amendments Motion to Move Previous Question By PEREZ, J (Y: 47 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-08-31 - Assembly - AB 1313 ALLEN Motion to Reconsider (Y: 48 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-08-30 - Assembly - AB 1313 ALLEN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 33 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [FAIL]
2012-08-28 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-20 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1313 Allen By Simitian (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-15 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-29 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - Assembly - AB 1313 LARA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-08-31 - Assembly - AB 1313 ALLEN Concurrence in Senate Amendments Motion to Move Previous Question By PEREZ, J (Y: 47 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-08-31 - Assembly - AB 1313 ALLEN Motion to Reconsider (Y: 48 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-08-30 - Assembly - AB 1313 ALLEN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 33 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [FAIL]
2012-08-28 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-20 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1313 Allen By Simitian (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-15 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-29 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - Assembly - AB 1313 LARA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-31 | Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 48. Noes 27. Page 6804.) Assembly refused to concur in Senate amendments. (Ayes 35. Noes 33. Page 6808.) | |
2012-08-30 | Assembly refused to concur in Senate amendments. (Ayes 33. Noes 30. Page 6707.) Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Allen. | |
2012-08-28 | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 28). | |
2012-08-21 | Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. | |
2012-08-20 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2012-08-20 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 15. Page 4580.). | |
2012-08-07 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-06 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2012-06-28 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-06-14 | Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R. | |
2012-01-30 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c). | |
2012-01-26 | From inactive file. Ordered to second reading. | |
2011-09-06 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Simitian. | |
2011-09-02 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2011-08-30 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-08-29 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (August 25). | |
2011-08-15 | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2011-06-29 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-06-16 | Referred to Com. on L. & I.R. | |
2011-06-02 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-06-02 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 27. Page 1825.) | |
2011-05-31 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-27 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 27). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2011-05-18 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2011-05-05 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (May 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-04-04 | Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. | |
2011-03-31 | Referred to Com. on L. & E. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-02-20 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | |
2011-02-18 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 1143 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 554 | Amended Code | Citation Text |