CA AB1312 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-08-30 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Chapter 6.5 (commencing with Section 6600) to Division 3 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to professions and vocations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

College Consultants Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-24 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-24 - Assembly - AB 1312 Low Assembly Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 4 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-30SenateIn committee: Held under submission.
2019-06-24SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-06-10SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-06-06SenateReferred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2019-05-24SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-24AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 63. Noes 4. Page 1979.)
2019-05-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-17AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2019-05-17AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 15. Noes 2.) (May 16).
2019-05-16AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1760.)
2019-05-15AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-05-13AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1609.)
2019-04-30AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-29AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2019-04-25AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (April 23).
2019-04-03AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2019-04-02AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-11AssemblyReferred to Com. on B. & P.
2019-02-25AssemblyRead first time.
2019-02-23AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
2019-02-22AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code6600New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback