CA AB131 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-30 - Died on Senate inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-30 - Died on Senate inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 18546, 18990, 18991, 18992, 18993, 19057.1, 19057.3, 19889, 19889.2, 19889.3, and 22879 of, to add Sections 19829.9840, 19829.9841, 19889.4, 22871.3, 22874.2, and 22944.5 to, and to repeal Sections 19057, 19057.2, and 19057.4 of, the Government Code, relating to state public employment, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
State public employment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-09-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - Assembly - AB 131 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By WEBER (Y: 51 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - Assembly - AB 131 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By WEBER (Y: 51 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | Died on Senate inactive file. |
2015-09-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (September 11). Ordered to third reading. Senate Rule 29.4 suspended. (Ayes 23. Noes 8. Page 2744.) Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Mitchell. |
2015-09-09 | Senate | Joint Rule 61(a) suspended. (Ayes 27. Noes 6. Page 2645.) Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. (Ayes 27. Noes 6. Page 2646.) |
2015-09-09 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2015-09-08 | Senate | Senate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Page 2600.) From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2015-03-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 27. Page 649.) |
2015-03-19 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 25. Page 611.) Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 25. Page 611.) Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-01-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2015-01-12 | Assembly | Read first time. From printer. May be heard in committee February 11. |
2015-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 18546 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 18990 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 18991 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 18992 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 18993 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 19057 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 19057.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 19057.2 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 19057.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 19057.4 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 19829.9840 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 19829.9841 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 19889 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 19889.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 19889.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 19889.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 22871.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 22874.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 22879 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 22944.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |