CA AB1306 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-11 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 8586.5 to the Government Code, relating to emergency services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

California Cybersecurity Integration Center.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-14 - Assembly - AB 1306 Obernolte Special Consent Calendar 1st Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-14 - Senate - Special Consent Calendar # AB1306 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Assembly - AB 1306 OBERNOLTE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Governmental Organization] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-11 Vetoed by Governor.
2017-09-25AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m.
2017-09-14AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3425.).
2017-09-14AssemblyOrdered to special consent calendar.
2017-09-14AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2017-09-14SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2912.).
2017-09-12SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2017-09-11SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-09-08SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2017-09-05SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-09-01SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2017-09-01SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 1).
2017-08-21SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2017-07-18SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-07-17SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (July 11).
2017-06-08SenateReferred to Com. on G.O.
2017-05-30SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-05-30AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 1. Page 1780.)
2017-05-26AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 26).
2017-05-10AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2017-04-19AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-04-17AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on G.O.
2017-04-06AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended.
2017-03-28AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (March 28). Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
2017-03-13AssemblyReferred to Coms. on P. & C.P. and G.O.
2017-02-19AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
2017-02-17AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code8586.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code8586.6New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback