CA AB13 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on March 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-20 - From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on March 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-20 - From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 7.1 of the Civil Code, to amend Sections 1100, 2170, 3001, 3011, 3015, 3016, 3017, 3020, 3102, 3106, 3110, 3111, 3116.5, 12283, and 14212 of, to add Sections 3006 and 3007 to, to add Chapter 3 (commencing with Section 3200) to Division 3 of, and to repeal Sections 357.5, 3000.5, 3016.7, 3025.5, 3025.7, 4005, 4005.5, 4005.7, 4006, and 4007 of, the Elections Code, and to amend Sections 6700, 19853, and 19853.1 of the Government Code, relating to elections.
Title
Elections: Election Day holiday: voting by mail.
Sponsors
Asm. Bill Essayli [R] | Asm. Laurie Davies [R] | Asm. Diane Dixon [R] | Asm. Heath Flora [R] |
Asm. Joe Patterson [R] | Asm. Megan Dahle [R] | Asm. Kate Sanchez [R] | Asm. Marie Waldron [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-15 - Assembly - Reconsideration (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Governmental Organization] (Y: 2 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-03-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Governmental Organization] (Y: 2 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-20 | Assembly | From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). |
2023-03-15 | Assembly | In committee: Reconsideration refused. |
2023-03-15 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. |
2023-01-30 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ELECTIONS. |
2023-01-26 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ELECTIONS. Read second time and amended. |
2023-01-26 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on ELECTIONS and G.O. |
2022-12-06 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 5. |
2022-12-05 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |