CA AB13 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 76140 of the Education Code, relating to public postsecondary education, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Public postsecondary education: community colleges: exemptions from nonresident tuition.
Sponsors
Asm. Rocky Chavez [R] | Asm. Young Kim [R] | Sen. Janet Nguyen [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-04 - Assembly - AB 13 CHAVEZ Third Reading Urgency (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Veterans Affairs (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Veterans Affairs (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | From Senate committee without further action. |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-06-04 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1913.). |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2015-03-25 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2015-03-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-03-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on V.A. |
2015-03-04 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2015-03-03 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on V.A. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (March 3). |
2015-01-16 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and V.A. |
2014-12-02 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 1. |
2014-12-01 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 76140 | Amended Code | Citation Text |