CA AB13 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-6)
Status: Passed on September 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 639, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-6)
Status: Passed on September 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 639, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 68075.5 of the Education Code, relating to postsecondary education, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Nonresident tuition exemption: veterans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-29 - Assembly - AB 13 CONWAY Concurrence- Urgency Added (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Supp 1 AB13 Conway By Knight (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-12 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-03 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-28 - Assembly - AB 13 CHAVEZ Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Veterans Affairs (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Supp 1 AB13 Conway By Knight (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-12 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-03 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-28 - Assembly - AB 13 CHAVEZ Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Veterans Affairs (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 639, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-10 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2014-08-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 31 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6725.) Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 6725.) Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6731.). |
2014-08-29 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4980.). |
2014-08-28 | Senate | Senate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Page 4952.) From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. Pursuant to Joint Rule 33.1, Joint Rule 61 suspended. (Page 4952.) Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4952.) |
2014-08-11 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2014-06-02 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-09-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-09-06 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-09-03 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-08-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30). |
2013-08-12 | Senate | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2013-07-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-06-24 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2013-06-17 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2013-05-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-05-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1656.) |
2013-05-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 24). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-01 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2013-04-17 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-03-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on V.A. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (March 19). Re-referred to Com. on V.A. |
2013-03-12 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2013-03-11 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. |
2013-02-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2013-01-31 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. |
2013-01-14 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and V.A. |
2012-12-04 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 3. |
2012-12-03 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 68075.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |