CA AB1299 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 603, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 603, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 14714 of, and to add Section 14717.1 to, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to Medi-Cal.
Title
Medi-Cal: specialty mental health services: foster children.
Sponsors
Asm. Sebastian Ridley-Thomas [D] | Asm. Cristina Garcia [D] | Sen. Joel Anderson [R] | Sen. Bob Hertzberg [D] |
Sen. Robert Huff [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-08-29 - Assembly - AB 1299 RIDLEY-THOMAS Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1299 Ridley-Thomas By Hertzberg (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-17 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Human Services (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1299 RIDLEY-THOMAS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Assembly - Amend, and do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Health with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1299 Ridley-Thomas By Hertzberg (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-17 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Human Services (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1299 RIDLEY-THOMAS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Assembly - Amend, and do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Health with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-25 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 603, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-25 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-09-07 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m. |
2016-08-29 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 1. Page 6350.). |
2016-08-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2016-08-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5269.). |
2016-08-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-08-17 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. (Ayes 26. Noes 13. Page 5065.) |
2016-08-16 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-08-01 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-08-27 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2015-08-17 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2015-07-16 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-07-15 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 14). |
2015-06-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HUMAN S. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and HUMAN S. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 1727.) |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1613.) From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-27 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2015-04-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2015-04-21 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-20 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 14). |
2015-03-23 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and HEALTH. |
2015-03-02 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2015-03-01 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 31. |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14695.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14714 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14717.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14717.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |