CA AB1292 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-15 - Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on May 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-15 - Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 739 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to energy utilities services.
Title
Electrical corporations: computation of average residential consumption of electricity and the baseline quantity for electricity usage.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-26 - Assembly - AB 1292 PATTERSON Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1292 Patterson By Hill (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Assembly - AB 1292 PATTERSON Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1292 Patterson By Hill (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Assembly - AB 1292 PATTERSON Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-15 | Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5. | |
2018-05-15 | Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2018-05-14 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2018-04-30 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2018-04-26 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4889.). |
2018-04-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after April 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3863.). |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | From inactive file. |
2017-09-16 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator McGuire. |
2017-08-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-08-29 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2017-07-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-07-10 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-27 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 20). |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1858.) |
2017-05-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2017-05-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 24). |
2017-04-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-26 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 19). |
2017-04-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2017-04-03 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & E. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-30 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2017-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 739 | Amended Code | Citation Text |