CA AB129 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-30 - Died on Senate inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-30 - Died on Senate inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 18546, 18990, 18991, 18992, 18993, 19057.1, 19057.3, 19889, 19889.2, and 19889.3 of, to add Section 19889.4 to, and to repeal Sections 19057, 19057.2, and 19057.4 of, the Government Code, relating to state civil service, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
State civil service.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-08-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - Assembly - AB 129 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By WEBER (Y: 51 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - Assembly - AB 129 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By WEBER (Y: 51 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | Died on Senate inactive file. |
2015-09-11 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Mitchell. |
2015-08-31 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-27 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (August 27). |
2015-08-24 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2015-03-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 27. Page 648.) |
2015-03-19 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 25. Page 611.) Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 25. Page 611.) Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-01-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2015-01-12 | Assembly | Read first time. From printer. May be heard in committee February 11. |
2015-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 18546 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 18990 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 18991 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 18992 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 18993 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 19057 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 19057.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 19057.2 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 19057.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 19057.4 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 19889 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 19889.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 19889.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 19889.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |