CA AB1289 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on August 28 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-09-06 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 1086, 1087, 1088, 1102, 1102.1, 1102.2, 1102.3, 1102.4, 1102.5, 1102.6a, 1102.6b, 1102.6c, 1102.9, 1102.155, 1103, 1103.1, 1103.2, 1103.3, 1103.4, 1103.5, 1103.8, 1103.9, 2079, 2079.6, 2079.7, 2079.8, 2079.9, 2079.10, 2079.10.5, 2079.10a, 2079.13, 2079.14, 2079.15, 2079.16, 2079.17, 2079.21, and 2079.22 of, to add Sections 1102.18, 1103.15, and 2079.25 to, to repeal Sections 1090, 1102.14, 1103.14, and 2079.18 of, and to repeal and add Section 1089 of, the Civil Code, relating to real estate.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Real property disclosure requirements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-28 - Assembly - AB 1289 ARAMBULA Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-22 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1289 Arambula By Hill (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Banking and Financial Institutions] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Assembly - AB 1289 ARAMBULA Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-06AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2018-08-28AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling.
2018-08-22AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2018-08-22SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5607.).
2018-08-07SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-06SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2018-07-05SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-07-03SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 27).
2018-06-19SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I.
2018-06-18SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on B. & F.I. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 12).
2018-05-15SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2018-03-15SenateReferred to Coms. on JUD. and B. & F.I.
2018-01-29SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-01-29AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 3868.)
2018-01-22AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-01-18AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (January 18).
2018-01-16AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-01-12AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2018-01-11AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (January 9).
2017-04-20AssemblyIn committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-04-17AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on JUD.
2017-04-06AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
2017-04-03AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2017-03-29AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-03-13AssemblyReferred to Com. on JUD.
2017-02-19AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
2017-02-17AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Civil Code1086Amended CodeCitation Text
Civil Code1087Amended CodeCitation Text
Civil Code1088Amended CodeCitation Text
Civil Code1089Repealed CodeCitation Text
Civil Code1090Amended CodeCitation Text
Civil Code1090.1New CodeSee Bill Text
Civil Code1102Amended CodeCitation Text
Civil Code1102.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Civil Code1102.12Amended CodeCitation Text
Civil Code1102.14Repealed CodeCitation Text
Civil Code1102.155Amended CodeCitation Text
Civil Code1102.18New CodeSee Bill Text
Civil Code1102.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Civil Code1102.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Civil Code1102.4Amended CodeCitation Text
Civil Code1102.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Civil Code1102.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Civil Code1102.9Amended CodeCitation Text
Civil Code1103Amended CodeCitation Text
Civil Code1103.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Civil Code1103.12Amended CodeCitation Text
Civil Code1103.14Repealed CodeCitation Text
Civil Code1103.15New CodeSee Bill Text
Civil Code1103.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Civil Code1103.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Civil Code1103.4Amended CodeCitation Text
Civil Code1103.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Civil Code1103.8Amended CodeCitation Text
Civil Code1103.9Amended CodeCitation Text
Civil Code2079Amended CodeCitation Text
Civil Code2079.10Amended CodeCitation Text
Civil Code2079.10.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Civil Code2079.13New CodeSee Bill Text
Civil Code2079.14Amended CodeCitation Text
Civil Code2079.15Amended CodeCitation Text
Civil Code2079.16Amended CodeCitation Text
Civil Code2079.17Amended CodeCitation Text
Civil Code2079.18Repealed CodeCitation Text
Civil Code2079.19Amended CodeCitation Text
Civil Code2079.20Amended CodeCitation Text
Civil Code2079.21New CodeSee Bill Text
Civil Code2079.22Amended CodeCitation Text
Civil Code2079.23Amended CodeCitation Text
Civil Code2079.24Amended CodeCitation Text
Civil Code2079.25New CodeSee Bill Text
Civil Code2079.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Civil Code2079.7Amended CodeCitation Text
Civil Code2079.8Amended CodeCitation Text
Civil Code2079.9Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback