CA AB1284 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 475, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend, repeal, and add Section 10133.1 of the Business and Professions Code, and to amend Sections 22000, 22753, 22780 of, to amend the heading of Division 9 (commencing with Section 22000) of, to amend, repeal, and add Sections 22001, 22007, 22010, 22101, 22101.5, 22102, 22103, 22104, 22105, 22105.3, 22106, 22107, 22109, 22151, 22152, 22153, 22154, 22155, 22156, 22157, 22159, 22161, 22162, 22163, 22164, 22168, 22169, 22700, 22701, 22706, 22712, 22714, and 22716 of, to add Sections 22003.5, 22015, 22016, 22017, 22018, 22018.5, 22019, 22020, 22068, 22100.5, 22252, 22552, and 22758 to, and to add Chapter 3.5 (commencing with Section 22680) to Division 9 of, the Financial Code, relating to financial institutions, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

California Financing Law: Property Assessed Clean Energy program: program administrators.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-16 - Assembly - AB 1284 DABABNEH Concurrence - Urgency Added (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-16 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-15 - Senate - W/O REF. TO FILE AB1284 Dababneh By Skinner Urgency Clause (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-15 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-15 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Assembly - AB 1284 CALDERON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-04 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 475, Statutes of 2017.
2017-10-04 Approved by the Governor.
2017-09-28AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
2017-09-16AssemblyUrgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 3537.).
2017-09-16AssemblyAssembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 3535.)
2017-09-16AssemblyFrom committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (September 16).
2017-09-16AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 3533.)
2017-09-16AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on L. GOV. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
2017-09-15AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2017-09-15SenateRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 2. Page 2988.).
2017-09-15SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 15).
2017-09-15SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (September 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-09-14SenateRe-referred to Com. on I., B. & F.I.
2017-09-14SenateJoint Rules 61 and 62 suspended. (Ayes 29. Noes 8. Page 2919.)
2017-09-12SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2017-09-12SenateSenate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Ayes 27. Noes 12. Page 2737.)
2017-09-08SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2017-09-01SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2017-08-28SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
2017-08-28SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2017-08-28SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-08-24SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2017-08-24SenateOrdered to second reading.
2017-08-24SenateFrom inactive file.
2017-06-15SenateOrdered to inactive file at the request of Senator Mendoza.
2017-06-15SenateFrom Consent Calendar.
2017-06-14SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar.
2017-06-13SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 7).
2017-05-18SenateReferred to Com. on ED.
2017-05-04SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-05-04AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1385.)
2017-05-02AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-01AssemblyOrdered to second reading.
2017-05-01AssemblyWithdrawn from committee.
2017-04-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-03-22AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2017-03-21AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
2017-03-20AssemblyReferred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2017-02-19AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
2017-02-17AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code10133.1New CodeSee Bill Text
Education Code33534Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code66025.91Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code66450Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code67300Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code67310Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code67311Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code67312Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code67313Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code78212Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code78230Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code78907Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code84750.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code84850Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code87003Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code87356Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code89037Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code99156Amended CodeCitation Text
Financial Code22000Amended CodeCitation Text
Financial Code22001New CodeSee Bill Text
Financial Code22007New CodeSee Bill Text
Financial Code22010New CodeSee Bill Text
Financial Code22101New CodeSee Bill Text
Financial Code22101.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Financial Code22102New CodeSee Bill Text
Financial Code22103New CodeSee Bill Text
Financial Code22104New CodeSee Bill Text
Financial Code22105New CodeSee Bill Text
Financial Code22105.3New CodeSee Bill Text
Financial Code22106New CodeSee Bill Text
Financial Code22107New CodeSee Bill Text
Financial Code22109New CodeSee Bill Text
Financial Code22151New CodeSee Bill Text
Financial Code22152New CodeSee Bill Text
Financial Code22153New CodeSee Bill Text
Financial Code22154New CodeSee Bill Text
Financial Code22155New CodeSee Bill Text
Financial Code22156New CodeSee Bill Text
Financial Code22157New CodeSee Bill Text
Financial Code22159New CodeSee Bill Text
Financial Code22161New CodeSee Bill Text
Financial Code22162New CodeSee Bill Text
Financial Code22163New CodeSee Bill Text
Financial Code22164New CodeSee Bill Text
Financial Code22168New CodeSee Bill Text
Financial Code22169New CodeSee Bill Text
Financial Code22700New CodeSee Bill Text
Financial Code22701New CodeSee Bill Text
Financial Code22706New CodeSee Bill Text
Financial Code22712New CodeSee Bill Text
Financial Code22714New CodeSee Bill Text
Financial Code22716New CodeSee Bill Text
Financial Code22753New CodeSee Bill Text
Financial Code22780New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback