CA AB1283 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 288, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 11105.08 of the Penal Code, and to amend Sections 10553.12, 11461, 11461.36, 11462, 16519.6, and 18358.30 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to foster care.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Foster care.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-08 - Assembly - AB 1283 Stone Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-09-07 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1283 Stone By Hurtado (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-07-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Assembly - AB 1283 Stone Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-24 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 288, Statutes of 2021.
2021-09-24 Approved by the Governor.
2021-09-15 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
2021-09-08AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0.).
2021-09-08AssemblyAssembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 42. Noes 13.)
2021-09-07AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 9 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2021-09-07SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0.).
2021-09-02SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-09-01SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2021-08-26SenateOrdered to third reading.
2021-08-26SenateFrom Consent Calendar.
2021-08-24SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2021-08-23SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
2021-08-18SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-08-16SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2021-07-07SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-06-08SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2021-05-27SenateReferred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and JUD.
2021-05-13SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2021-05-13AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1410.)
2021-05-06AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2021-05-05AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 5).
2021-04-22AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-04-19AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
2021-04-15AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended.
2021-03-04AssemblyReferred to Com. on HUM. S.
2021-02-22AssemblyRead first time.
2021-02-20AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
2021-02-19AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback