CA AB128 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Passed on October 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 765, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 1834.8 of the Civil Code, and to amend Section 24106 of the Food and Agricultural Code, relating to equines.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Equines: protection.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-09 - Assembly - AB 128 Gloria Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-04 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB128 Gloria et al. By Hertzberg (Y: 33 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Assembly - AB 128 Gloria Assembly Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-12 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 765, Statutes of 2019.
2019-10-12 Approved by the Governor.
2019-09-12AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2019-09-09AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 3118.).
2019-09-05AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 7 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2019-09-04SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 5. Page 2513.).
2019-08-27SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-08-26SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2019-08-19SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-08-15SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2019-08-13SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-08-12SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2019-07-10SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (July 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-06-28SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2019-06-06SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2019-05-22SenateReferred to Com. on JUD.
2019-05-09SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-09AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 1573.)
2019-05-02AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-01AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 1).
2019-04-25AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-24AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
2019-04-22AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-11AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2019-04-10AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (April 9).
2019-04-01AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
2019-03-28AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W., P., & W. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-28AssemblyReferred to Com. on W., P., & W.
2019-01-07AssemblyRead first time.
2018-12-05AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee January 4.
2018-12-04AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Civil Code1834.8Amended CodeCitation Text
Food and Agricultural Code24106Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback