CA AB1269 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 116, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 116, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 45308 of the Education Code, relating to classified employees.
Title
Classified school employees: layoff: reemployment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-07-01 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB1269 Portantino (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-22 - Senate - Be adopted (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-22 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-23 - Assembly - AB 1269 PORTANTINO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Public Employees, Retirement and Social Security (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-22 - Senate - Be adopted (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-22 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-23 - Assembly - AB 1269 PORTANTINO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Public Employees, Retirement and Social Security (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-25 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 116, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-07-25 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2011-07-11 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:45 p.m. | |
2011-07-01 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |
2011-07-01 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 1687.). | |
2011-06-23 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2011-06-22 | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 22). | |
2011-06-15 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2011-06-02 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |
2011-05-23 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-05-23 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1495.) | |
2011-05-05 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-04 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (May 4). | |
2011-04-15 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S. | |
2011-03-21 | Referred to Coms. on ED. and P.E., R. & S.S. | |
2011-02-20 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | |
2011-02-18 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 45308 | Amended Code | Citation Text |