CA AB1263 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 53, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 53, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 11785.5 to the Insurance Code, relating to the State Compensation Insurance Fund.
Title
State Compensation Insurance Fund: directors and
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-11 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB1263 Williams (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - Assembly - AB 1263 WILLIAMS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - Assembly - AB 1263 WILLIAMS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-01 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 53, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-06-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2011-06-21 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:40 a.m. | |
2011-06-13 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |
2011-06-11 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1383.). | |
2011-06-09 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2011-06-08 | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 8). | |
2011-05-19 | Referred to Com. on INS. | |
2011-05-05 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-05-05 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1236.) | |
2011-04-14 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-04-13 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 13). | |
2011-04-11 | Re-referred to Com. on INS. | |
2011-04-07 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-03-21 | Referred to Com. on INS. | |
2011-02-20 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | |
2011-02-18 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Insurance Code | 11785.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |