CA AB1261 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-31 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 215 and 48900.5 of the Education Code, relating to pupil discipline.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pupil discipline: pupil suicide prevention.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-07-13 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB1261 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - AB 1261 BERMAN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-31 Vetoed by Governor.
2017-07-18AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:45 p.m.
2017-07-13AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2017-07-13SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2024.).
2017-07-11SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2017-07-10SenateFrom committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
2017-06-21SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-06-08SenateReferred to Com. on ED.
2017-05-26SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-05-26AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1721.)
2017-05-18AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2017-05-17AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 17).
2017-05-04AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-05-03AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2017-05-02AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 26).
2017-04-03AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on ED.
2017-03-30AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
2017-03-30AssemblyReferred to Com. on ED.
2017-02-19AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
2017-02-17AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code215Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code48900.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code48915Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code48916.7New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback