CA AB125 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 24, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 24, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1758.96 and 1758.992 of the Insurance Code, relating to insurance, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Insurance: guaranteed asset protection.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-25 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB125 Committee on INS. (Solorio) Urgency Clause (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - Assembly - AB 125 INS. Third Reading Urgency By SOLORIO (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Insurance (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - Assembly - AB 125 INS. Third Reading Urgency By SOLORIO (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Insurance (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-10 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 24, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-05-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2011-04-28 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2011-04-25 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |
2011-04-25 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 709.). | |
2011-04-14 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-04-13 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 13). | |
2011-04-07 | Referred to Com. on INS. | |
2011-03-10 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-03-10 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 530.). | |
2011-03-08 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-03-07 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2011-03-03 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 2). | |
2011-02-24 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on INS. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (February 24). Re-referred to Com. on INS. | |
2011-02-23 | Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. | |
2011-02-22 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-01-27 | Referred to Com. on L. & E. | |
2011-01-11 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 10. | |
2011-01-10 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Insurance Code | 1758.96 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 1758.992 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 1720.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |