CA AB1249 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 717, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 717, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 10541 of, and to add Sections 10544.5 and 10545 to, the Water Code, relating to water quality.
Title
Integrated regional water management plans: nitrate, arsenic, perchlorate, or hexavalent chromium contamination.
Sponsors
Asm. Rudy Salas [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-25 - Assembly - AB 1249 SALAS Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 64 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1249 Salas (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - Assembly - AB 1249 SALAS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1249 Salas (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - Assembly - AB 1249 SALAS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 717, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-05 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2014-08-25 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 64. Noes 15. Page 6390.). |
2014-08-21 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 23 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 2. Page 4728.). |
2014-08-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 14). |
2014-08-04 | Senate | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-06-30 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 25). |
2014-06-18 | Senate | In committee: Testimony taken. Hearing postponed by committee. |
2014-06-02 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-05-20 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2014-01-27 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-01-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 17. Page 3688.) |
2014-01-23 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 3.) (January 23). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-01-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (January 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-01-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2014-01-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on W.,P. & W. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P. & W. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. (Ayes 51. Noes 25. Page 3496.) |
2013-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2013-02-24 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 26. |
2013-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Water Code | 10541 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 10544.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Water Code | 10545 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Water Code | 10910 | Amended Code | Citation Text |