CA AB1246 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-07-11 - Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 10112.285 to the Insurance Code, relating to health care coverage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health care coverage: basic health care services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-29 - Assembly - AB 1246 Limón Assembly Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 19 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-11SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2019-07-10SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (July 10).
2019-07-02SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-06-12SenateReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2019-05-30SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-29AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 19. Page 2094.)
2019-05-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-16AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2019-05-16AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (May 16).
2019-04-24AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-04-10AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-03-11AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2019-02-22AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
2019-02-21AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Insurance Code10112.285New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback