CA AB124 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 695, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 236.23 and 1170 of, and to add Sections 236.15, 236.24, and 1016.7 to, the Penal Code, relating to criminal procedure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal procedure.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-10 - Assembly - AB 124 Kamlager Concurrence in Senate Amendments By GARCIA, C (Y: 55 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-09-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB124 Kamlager et al. By Kamlager (Y: 23 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-09-02 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB124 Kamlager et al. Reconsider (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-09-02 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB124 Kamlager et al (Y: 28 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-06 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - AB 124 Kamlager Assembly Third Reading By GARCIA, C (Y: 54 N: 12 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-08 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 695, Statutes of 2021.
2021-10-08 Approved by the Governor.
2021-09-22 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
2021-09-10AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 55. Noes 16.).
2021-09-10AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2021-09-10SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 9.).
2021-09-07SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-09-03SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2021-09-02SenateReconsideration granted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.)
2021-09-02SenateMotion to reconsider made by Senator Kamlager.
2021-09-02SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 8.).
2021-08-30SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-08-26SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2021-08-26SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 26).
2021-08-16SenateIn committee: Referred to suspense file.
2021-07-14SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-07-13SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (July 6).
2021-06-16SenateReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2021-06-03SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2021-06-02AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 12.)
2021-05-24AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-05-20AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 20).
2021-05-05AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2021-04-21AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-04-21AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2021-04-19AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2021-04-15AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
2021-04-06AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2021-01-11AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2021-01-11AssemblyRead first time.
2020-12-19AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee January 18.
2020-12-18AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Penal Code1016.7New CodeSee Bill Text
Penal Code1170Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code236.15New CodeSee Bill Text
Penal Code236.23Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code236.24New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB124
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB124#99INT
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB124#98AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB124#97AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB124#96AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB124#95AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB124#94ENR
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB124#93CHP
Roll Callhttp://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billVotesClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB124

Bill Comments

feedback