CA AB1239 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on September 11 2023 - 75% progression
Action: 2023-09-14 - In Senate. Held at Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on September 11 2023 - 75% progression
Action: 2023-09-14 - In Senate. Held at Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 4011.11 of, and to add Section 2068 to, the Penal Code, relating to incarcerated persons.
Title
Incarcerated persons: Family Planning, Access, Care, and Treatment Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1239 Calderon By Menjivar (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-07-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - Assembly - AB 1239 Calderon Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - Assembly - AB 1239 Calderon Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-14 | Senate | In Senate. Held at Desk. |
2023-09-14 | Assembly | Ordered to the Senate. |
2023-09-14 | Assembly | Withdrawn from Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2023-09-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2023-09-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2556.). |
2023-08-17 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2023-08-17 | Senate | From Consent Calendar. |
2023-08-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2023-08-14 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2023-07-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-06-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB S. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on PUB S. |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and PUB S. |
2023-05-26 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-05-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1812.) |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2023-05-17 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 17). |
2023-05-03 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2023-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-03-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2023-03-23 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2023-03-23 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2023-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2023-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 2068 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 4011.11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |